skip to content

Saleeb, Rola Magdy Youssef

CPSO#: 96099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
2nd floor cardinal carter wing
Pathology department
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163604000 Ext. 46129 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sherif Mikhail and Rola Saleeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saleeb ( CPSO# 96099 )
Dr. S. Mikhail ( CPSO# 116868)

Business Address:
Hamilton Urban Core Community Health Centre
71 Rebecca Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 522-3233

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Department of Lab Medicine and Pathiobiology
Room 6231
1 Kings College Circle
Toronto ON  M5S 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 978-7535

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROLA MAGDY YOUSSEF SALEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019