skip to content

Salama, Arielle

CPSO#: 89152

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5418
Fax: (416) 864-5480 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arielle Salama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salama ( CPSO# 89152 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIELLE SALAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013