skip to content

Salahuddin, Afroze

CPSO#: 89931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1224 Dundas Street West
Unit 108
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G7
Phone: (905 ) 2751111 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNIT 1D-1010 Kennedy Circle
Milton ON  L9T 0J9
Canada
Phone: 9058648787
Fax: 9058641522
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.Afroze Salahuddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salahuddin ( CPSO# 89931 )

Business Address:
201 Oak Walk Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 6M3
Phone Number: (905) 257-3297

Business Address:
108 - 1224 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G7
Phone Number: (905) 275-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AFROZE SALAHUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAHUDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Jan 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011