skip to content

Sakran, Mahmoud Hassan Mohamed Ali

CPSO#: 96184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Sep 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Sana'a, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sakran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sakran ( CPSO# 96184 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:08 May 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2020 Active
             Dr. Mahmoud Hassan Mohamed Ali Sakran may practise medicine independently in
            pediatrics.