skip to content

Sakoor, Ahmed

CPSO#: 22473

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Ahmed Sakoor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 2, 2015:

Dr. Sakoor has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.