skip to content

Sajo, Iidiko Mary

CPSO#: 31168

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Mar 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Woburn Medical Dental Centre at: 4129 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1E 2S2, or via telephone: 416-439-1991, or via Fax: 416-439-3593.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Mar 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Iidiko Mary Sajo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sajo engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Sajo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)