skip to content

Sajed, Sina

CPSO#: 84882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Hwy #2
Oshawa ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: 905-721-2760
Fax: 905-721-2566 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Memory Program
1 Valleybrook Drive, Suite 400
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Canada
Phone: (416) 386-9761
Fax: (416) 386-0458
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Sajed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sajed ( CPSO# 84882 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-2760

Business Address:
Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SINA SAJED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008