skip to content

Saif, Sameh Ahmed Shawky Abdelhamid

CPSO#: 96327

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5975 Abbott St
Lasalle ON  N9J 3L6
Phone: 5149145450

Additional Practice Location(s)

1221 Pine Grove Ave
McLaren Port Huron
Port Huron MI  48060-3511
United States
Phone: +1 (810) 987-5
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: SAMEH SAIF MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saif ( CPSO# 96327 )

Business Address:
5975 Abbott St
Lasalle ON  N9J 3L6


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMEH AHMED SHAWKY ABDELHAMID SAIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020