skip to content

Saif, Sameh Ahmed Shawky Abdelhamid

CPSO#: 96327

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
275 Boul Hébert
The Edmundston Regional Hospital
Edmundston NB  E3V 4E4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMEH AHMED SHAWKY ABDELHAMID SAIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020