skip to content

Saibil, Samuel David

CPSO#: 93175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre UHN
OPG 7-911
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416)9464501 Ext. 4831
Fax: (416)9466546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samuel Saibil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:22 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMUEL DAVID SAIBIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIBIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Apr 2019
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017