skip to content

Sahni, Puja Kaur

CPSO#: 87016

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
2300 Eglinton Ave West, Suite 201
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: 905-997-7277
Fax: 905-997-1860 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street, Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Sahni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sahni ( CPSO# 87016 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Unit 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 813-2277

Business Address:
201 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 997-7277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PUJA KAUR SAHNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011