skip to content

Sahi, Nidhi

CPSO#: 87726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIDHI SAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 28 Aug 2007 to 27 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2019