skip to content

Al-Bakkal, Sahar

CPSO#: 68085

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Emergency Department
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 4L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ahmed & Dr. S. Al-Bakkal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 13 2012
Corporation Name: Dr. Sahar Al-Bakkal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Bakkal ( CPSO# 68085 )

Business Address:
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone Number: (613) 244-2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAHAR AL-BAKKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BAKKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998