skip to content

Saginur, Raphael

CPSO#: 27277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raphael Saginur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For patients of the Ottawa Hospital: 613-798-5555 ext. 18720 For patients of the Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre: 807-737-2877 ext. 4753
Date Received: 17 Sep 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 10 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2019
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.