skip to content

Saginur, Michael David

CPSO#: 89764

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Saginur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021
Corporation Name: Michael Saginur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saginur ( CPSO# 89764 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID SAGINUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGINUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
EL - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012