skip to content

Safka, Katherine Anne

CPSO#: 93114

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 201
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: 705-775-4505
Fax: 705-775-4506 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Safka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Safka ( CPSO# 93114 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
26 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE SAFKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014