skip to content

Saffie, Muntasir

CPSO#: 93456

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Room A3-11
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43790
Fax: (905) 575-2645 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospital - TB Clinic
25 Charlton Ave. East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 34198
Fax: 9055255806
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saffie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saffie ( CPSO# 93456 )
Dr. M. Saffie ( CPSO# 97839 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUNTASIR SAFFIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014