skip to content

Saffer, Mark David

CPSO#: 28170

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Promenade
1 Promenade Circle
Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone: (905) 762-0525
Fax: (905) 762-0527 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saffer ( CPSO# 28170 )
Dr. L. Saffer ( CPSO# 31590 )

Business Address:
The Promenade
302 - 1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 762-0525

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001