skip to content

Saeed, Tariq

CPSO#: 28234

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1976
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
160 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 1W4
Phone: (905) 276-7252
Fax: (905) 276-7256 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tariq Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saeed ( CPSO# 28234 )
Dr. O. Saeed ( CPSO# 100390)

Business Address:
Suite 104
160 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 276-7252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARIQ SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jun 1984
Summary:

 In June 1984, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Saeed guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Saeed's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three 
 months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 31 Jan 1986
Hearing Date(s): 11 Jun 1984