skip to content

Saeed Kamil, Zaid Kamal

CPSO#: 91326

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 5863 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Kamal Saeed Kamil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAID KAMAL SAEED KAMIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED KAMIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014