Saeed, Akhter (CPSO#: 97290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Feb 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akhter Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saeed ( CPSO# 97290 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-5214

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Akhter   Saeed  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  an  emergency
            department, only.