skip to content

Sadry, Sharon Arnavaz

CPSO#: 95723

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
High Metabolic Clinic
214 - 507 Lakeshore Rd East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H9
Phone: 905-271-7777
Fax: 855-605-1272 Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records requests can be faxed to 905-595-1566.
Date Received: 26 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARON ARNAVAZ SADRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015