skip to content

Sadreddini, Masoud

CPSO#: 96929

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jun 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Groningen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: 8073453355
Fax: 8073450099 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Sadreddini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadreddini ( CPSO# 96929 )

Business Address:
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 629-9778


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:02 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Masoud Sadreddini may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in cardiology and in a setting that is approved by the Chair,
                        Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences,
                        Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Sadreddini holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sadreddini  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sadreddini's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sadreddini's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 2, 2017, and expires on June 30, 2023. Upon renewal of Dr. Sadreddini's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.