skip to content

Sadler, Dafni Addisen

CPSO#: 96154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Child and Adolescent Mental Health
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 416 813 4421
Fax: 416 813 1594 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAFNI ADDISEN SADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016