skip to content

Sadikali, Fakhruddin

CPSO#: 26973

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Fakhruddin Sadikali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Sadikali’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Sadikali has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.