skip to content

Sadera, Neena Jyoti Ruby

CPSO#: 89464

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1182 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Phone: (905) 631-1939 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neena J. R. Sadera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadera ( CPSO# 89464 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1182 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEENA JYOTI RUBY SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014