skip to content

Sadera, Abhimanyu Jagir Singh

CPSO#: 89941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
470 Bronte St South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 636-0766
Fax: (905) 636-0429 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abhimanyu Sadera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABHIMANYU JAGIR SINGH SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016