skip to content

Sadaf, Arifa

CPSO#: 84950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7111 Syntex Drive, 3rd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Phone: 905-362-0223 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Saskatchewan

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIFA SADAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2006 to 23 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Sep 2007
Research Fellows - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2007 to 02 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012