skip to content

Sacks, Diane Paula Gainen

CPSO#: 23746

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pittsburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Dec 2013


Address: Records Management 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 toll free: 1.800.775.0093 fax 1.888.316.4125 [email protected]
Instructions: Contact Records Management
Date Received: 20 Sep 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015