skip to content

Sachdeva, Nandini

CPSO#: 89423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: 9054946715 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101, Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 4164942120
Fax: 4167473610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial Centre
20, Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 5197515544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nandini Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 89423 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
2100
bovaird drive east
brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: 9054942120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANDINI SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013