skip to content

Sachdeva, Ashok

CPSO#: 93001

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BRAMPTON EAST MEDICAL CENTRE
UNIT 1, 4525 EBENEZER ROAD
BRAMPTON,ON
Brampton ON  L6P 2K8
Phone: 905-794-2003
Fax: 905-794-2054 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stoneycreek Medical Walk in Clinic
2-A, 140 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek, ON
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Canada
Phone: 905-561-9255
Fax: 905-561-4391
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Dundurn Medical Centre
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Canada
Phone: 905-529-4040
Fax: 905-529-4494
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

10 Cottrelle Blvd,
Suite 103
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: 9054562888
Fax: 9054562868
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashok Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 93001 )

Business Address:
1 - 1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Phone Number: (807) 622-3995

Business Address:
4525, EBENEZER ROAD, UNIT 1
BRAMPTON ON  L6P 2K8

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients can request their medical record from Record Storage and Retrieval Services by calling 416-398-0638 or 888-563-3732.
Date Received: 19 Nov 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHOK SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012