skip to content

Sachar, Seerat

CPSO#: 93199

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Seerat Sachar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sachar ( CPSO# 93199 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active
             Dr. Seerat Sachar may practice medicine independently in Internal Medicine as a
            Hospitalist, only.