skip to content

Sacevich, Nathan Lee

CPSO#: 86452

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
547 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 684-4364
Fax: (905) 684-4466 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nathan Sacevich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sacevich ( CPSO# 86452 )

Business Address:
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN LEE SACEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACEVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014