skip to content

Sacco, Michael Francis

CPSO#: 28409

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Jul 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Jul 1987

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Nov 1987
Summary:

 The Discipline Committee found Dr. Sacco guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in 
 sexual impropriety with a patient pursuant to s.60 of the Health Disciplines Act and that he 
 engaged in conduct or anact relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the 
 cirucmstnaces would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, pursuant to s.60(3)(c) of the Health Discipline Act.

As of the date of this 
 hearing, November 12, 1987, Dr. Sacco was not a member of the College, although he had been a 
 member at the time of the offences of professional misconduct as found by the Committee to have 
 occurred. Counsel advised the Committee and the Committee accepted that in such circumstances, the 
 Committee did not have jurisdiction to make a disciplinary order under section 60 of the Act.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 12 Nov 1987


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 May 1986
Summary:

 In May 1986, Dr. Sacco pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Sacco guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Sacco's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 23 Sep 1987
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1986