skip to content

Sacchini, Clara

CPSO#: 96829

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University Of Parma, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Karma Clinic
400 - 18 Pine St
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 570-0090
Fax: (519) 570-3202 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dep. of Obstetrics & Gynecolo
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73158
Fax: (905) 527-2675
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C2
Canada
Phone: 519 570 3660
Fax: 519-745-2509
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sacchini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sacchini ( CPSO# 96829 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Karma Clinic
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0090


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active
             Dr.  Clara  Sacchini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in obstetrics and
            gynaecology limited to maternal fetal medicine.