skip to content

Sabourin, Marcel Joseph Lawrence

CPSO#: 28796

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: C/O Dr Neil Haney 216-350 Sparks St Ottawa ON K1R 7S8 Phone# (613) 235-6576 Alternative phone# (613) 238-5960 email: [email protected] Fax# (613) 800-0385
Date Received: 31 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020