skip to content

Sabieh, Sadia

CPSO#: 94842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sabieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabieh ( CPSO# 94842 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Street
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active
 Dr.  Sadia Sabeih may practise medicine independently in internal medicine as a
            Hospitalist, only.