skip to content

Saber Hamishegi, Helaleh

CPSO#: 89435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5925 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 3V7
Phone: (416) 222-2331
Fax: (416) 222-2394 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

9580 Yonge St
Viva Health Centre
Unit 6
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V6
Canada
Phone: 905 237 8482
Fax: 905 237 8483
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Helaleh Saber Hamishegi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saber Hamishegi ( CPSO# 89435 )

Business Address:
5925 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 3V7
Phone Number: (416) 222-2331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELALEH SABER HAMISHEGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABER HAMISHEGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2015