skip to content

Saari, Kendra Ann

CPSO#: 93515

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saari Medical Clinic
93 Monk Street
P0 Box 787
Chapleau, ON P0M 1K0
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone: (705) 860-9859
Fax: 7059980530 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chapleau General Hospital
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau, Ontario
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-864-3060
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kendra A. Saari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saari ( CPSO# 93515 )

Business Address:
93 Monk Street
PO Box 787
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 860-9859

Business Address:
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 864-1520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENDRA ANN SAARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012