skip to content

Saad, Reda Shibl Mahmoud

CPSO#: 86111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital, Metro
Campus, Dept of Laboratory Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue, Windsor ON N8W1L1
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. x52076
Fax: (519) 258-5124 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Canada
Phone: 519-437-6400 Ext. 6011
Fax: 519-437-6140
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reda Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Reda Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saad ( CPSO# 86111 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:26 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REDA SHIBL MAHMOUD SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008