skip to content

Saad, George

CPSO#: 93455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dive E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. George Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saad ( CPSO# 93455 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Sep 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2019