skip to content

Saad, Amany Ibrahim Mohamed

CPSO#: 96786

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 17 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 18 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 26 Apr 2016
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2016