skip to content

Sa, Ah Young Grace

CPSO#: 89116

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Blair Rd
Cambridge ON  N1S 2H9
Phone: 519-621-7831
Fax: 519-621-2702 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

B3-725 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Canada
Phone: 519-620-2775
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. A. Sa ( CPSO# 89116 )

Business Address:
201-745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 260-0925

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Suite 201
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AH YOUNG GRACE SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010