skip to content

STIRCU, CRISTINA Ecaterina

CPSO#: 89806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laurier Medical and Walk In Clinic
497 Laurier Avenue, Unit 9
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone: (905) 203 0624
Fax: (289) 270 2970 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cristina Stircu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. STIRCU ( CPSO# 89806 )

Business Address:
Laurier Medical and Walk-in Clinic
497 Laurier Avenue
Unit 9
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 203-0624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRISTINA ECATERINA STIRCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIRCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010