skip to content

Youssef, Sherif

CPSO#: 111512

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 4165864800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166032581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rizk ( CPSO# 88725 )
Dr. S. Youssef ( CPSO# 111512)

Business Address:
Oak Park Medical Clinic
Oakville
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 6W5
Phone Number: (905) 257-1006

Business Address:
1750 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M9C 5H5
Phone Number: (416) 626-6363


Corporation Name: SHERIF YOUSSEF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Youssef ( CPSO# 111512)

Business Address:
399 Bathurst St
8th floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
4th floor
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERIF YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 13 Mar 2017 to 09 Apr 2017
EL - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 07 May 2018 to 03 Jun 2018
EL - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020