skip to content

Yang, Stephanie Pui-Yin

CPSO#: 97972

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Bond 3-056 Rheumatology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5550
Fax: 416-864-5549 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yang W.Y. Philip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yang ( CPSO# 30828 )
Dr. A. Yang ( CPSO# 109331)
Dr. S. Yang ( CPSO# 97972 )

Business Address:
Bridlewood Professional Centre
203 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 493-4424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE PUI-YIN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017