skip to content

Singer, Syndie Beth

CPSO#: 84702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-3377 Ext. 2346
Fax: (705) 434-5219 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Syndie Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singer ( CPSO# 84702 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYNDIE BETH SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011