skip to content

Siddha, Sanjay Kumar

CPSO#: 87552

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Nov 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education: Netaji Subhash Chandra Bose Med College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905)235-5232
Fax: (905)235-5231 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 GRENVILLE STREET
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2690
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#309, 1366 Yonge street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: 416-963-5955
Fax: 416-963-5612
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S.K. Siddha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddha ( CPSO# 87552 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor, New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2023 Active
 As from November 6th, 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sanjay Kumar Siddha in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Siddha to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking") of
DR. SANJAY KUMAR SIDDHA
("Dr. Siddha") to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Siddha, certificate of registration number 87552, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-426689-V3M8X0 (the "Investigation") into my care of a patient in my dermatology practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
 
(5)	Professional Education

(a)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1.	Medical Records Documentation, College policy;

2.	Good Practices - Physician-patient: Documentation and record keeping, CMPA;

3.	Transitions in Care, College policy; and

4.	Managing Tests, College policy.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that if any of the resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
 
(7)	Monitoring

(a)	I, Dr. Siddha, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
 
(b)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Siddha's care of a patient in his dermatology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Siddha will engage in professional education including in test result management, collaboration and medical record keeping.

Dr. Siddha's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddha, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Siddha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and/or to all Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Siddha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Siddha, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
 
(d)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 6, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sanjay Kumar Siddha to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6th 2023:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Siddha’s care of a patient in his dermatology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Siddha will engage in professional education including in test result management, collaboration and medical record keeping.

Dr. Siddha’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.