skip to content

Shamon, Sandy Danyal

CPSO#: 96025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Assyrian, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2N3
Phone: (519) 622-7800
Fax: (519) 622-7178 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 George St South
Cambridge ON  N1S2N3
Canada
Phone: (519) 622-7800
Fax: (519) 622-7178
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. D. Shamon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shamon ( CPSO# 96025 )

Business Address:
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 622-7800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDY DANYAL SHAMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.