skip to content

Saxena, Shiv Kumar

CPSO#: 83243

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: (519) 749-4293 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: (519) 749-6426
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

KW Healthy Living Centre
1360 Weber St East
Kitchener ON  N2A1C4
Canada
Phone: 519-893-6060
Fax: 519-893-6061
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shiv Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saxena ( CPSO# 83243 )
Dr. R. Satsangi ( CPSO# 94569 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
99 North Field Drive
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P9
Phone Number: (519) 279-1497

Business Address:
KW Healthy Living Centre
1360 Weber Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 893-6060

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
5th Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIV KUMAR SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008